Accounts and annual returns ST. MARY'S PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1052697
Charity reporting is overdue by 1046 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 681 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 681 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1046 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1046 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required