NEWSPRING CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Faith. The preaching and proclamation of the Christian Gospel. The teaching of Christian doctrine and principles. The pastoral care of Christian people. The printing and distribution of literature video and audio recordings. The relief of persons in need, hardship or distress. The advancement of Christian education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 06 February 1996: Standard registration
- THE KING'S CHURCH, WAKEFIELD (Previous name)
- WAKEFIELD COVENANT COMMUNITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Kingsley Sessions | Chair | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert Michael Haley | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julia Ford | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHARLES MELLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.60k | £148.46k | £105.95k | £151.84k | £115.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.68k | £112.60k | £87.79k | £149.02k | £107.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.51k | N/A | £15.00k | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 06/01/1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 1/6/1998 & AMENDED 03/11/2013
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
YORKSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
NewSpring Centre
Illingworth Street
Ossett
West Yorkshire
WF5 8AL
- Phone:
- 01924728551
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window