Financial history PEGASUS OPERA COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1052704
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £235.97k £124.60k £376.24k £460.57k £786.64k
Total expenditure £139.77k £130.51k £269.83k £337.06k £509.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £27.00k £11.96k £29.80k £20.58k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £440.77k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.88k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £270.22k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.24k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £62.52k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £472.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £37.00k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0