THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE NEW SYNAGOGUE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE OF NETANYA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of the New Synagogue and residents of Netanya.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 07 February 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Cohen | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Joseph Gordon | Trustee | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALLAN HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.77k | £1.06k | £3.42k | £745 | £7.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £21 | £4.59k | £7.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 DECEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH RELIGION; AND (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION GENERALLY; AND (C) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED, POOR AND NEEDY ATTENDING THE CENTRE; AND (D) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNAL CENTRE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE RESIDENTS OF NETANYA; ALL AT AND IN CONNECTION WITH THE NEW SYNAGOGUE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE AT 7 MACDONALD STREET, NETANYA, ISRAEL
Area of benefit
NETANYA, ISRAEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 26
Leamington House
23 Stonegrove
Edgware
HA8 7TN
- Phone:
- 02089587854
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window