NORTH POINT CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday services, youth meetings/events, childrens club, mother and toddler group, elderly groups, house groups, out reaches providing food, clothes, advice to homeless people. Various guest events providing entertainment free of charge. Religious activities i.e. weddings, wakes etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 08 February 1996: Standard registration
- BELL GREEN NEW LIFE CHURCH (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Wyndow | Chair | 28 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA BOYLE | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Steven john Pointon | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS SUE SHERIDAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.48k | £53.96k | £55.13k | £77.23k | £177.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.78k | £54.40k | £49.72k | £85.83k | £120.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 January 2024
(These accounts |
05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND TRUST DEED ADOPTED ON 4 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Boveney
Bede Village
Hospital Lane
BEDWORTH
Warwickshire
CV12 0PF
- Phone:
- 02476687524
- Email:
- joan@cessna617.plus.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window