BETHEL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP WEST BROMWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Communion and Gospel services, Bible Study, Prayer Times, Mothers and Toddlers, Childrens activities for 5-11 year olds, Teenagers activities, Aftrenoon classes for the retired, Coffee mornings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sandwell
Governance
- 08 February 1996: Standard registration
- BETHEL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- BETHEL TEMPLE CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Deepak Cherian | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Gordon Harris | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER KAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAYDN LAWRENCE SHARMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENNIS ARTHUR SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.70k | £57.03k | £76.47k | £77.05k | £175.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.99k | £56.12k | £93.53k | £76.08k | £112.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND TRUST DEED ADOPTED ON 3 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WEST BROMWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
GADS LANE
WEST BROMWICH
WEST MIDLANDS
B70 8QL
- Phone:
- 01215258434
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
bcfwestbrom.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window