Financial history IMPACT COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity Number: 1052753
Charity reporting is up to date (49 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £103.12k £103.12k £107.99k £88.87k £49.55k
Total expenditure £95.69k £95.69k £77.84k £88.95k £63.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A