IMPACT COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of Impact Community Church, and associated ministries including RDS Ministries and Impact Community Hub is the furtherance of the Christian faith and social action within the local community, to reach out to family's and to help restore hope in the area of North West Manchester.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Uganda
Governance
- 08 February 1996: Standard registration
- OASIS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- THE RIVER OF LIFE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (NORTHWEST MANCHESTER) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIJAH BOSWELL | Chair | 28 January 2013 |
|
|||
HAYLEY DAWN BOSWELL | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|||
ALAN JACKSON | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|||
REV J MARSDEN | Trustee | 08 January 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.12k | £103.12k | £107.99k | £88.87k | £49.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.69k | £95.69k | £77.84k | £88.95k | £63.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 March 2025 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 March 2025 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 May 2023 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 May 2023 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31/08/1993 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MIDDLETON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Impact Community Church
St. James Church
Byron Street
OLDHAM
OL8 4QT
- Phone:
- 07772460520
- Email:
- info@impactchurch.co
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window