HOPE CHURCH (UK)

Charity Number: 1052769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We operate as a church, preaching the gospel. Our evangelistic activities include Parent & Toddlers, Junior Church, Youth and Wednesday Bright Hour. Income is used to support missionary enterprise at home and abroad. Other usual church activities take place such as Bible Study, Communion, evangelism, community work and children's outreaches.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £101,015
Total expenditure: £94,706

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Coventry City
  • Dudley
  • Sandwell
  • Solihull
  • Walsall
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ASSEMBLIES OF GOD PENTECOSTAL CHURCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIMON VYTAUTAS SMAILUS Chair
None on record
Elizabeth Jane Ball Trustee 04 September 2022
None on record
Dave Mckeown Trustee 06 February 2019
None on record
John Price Trustee 06 February 2019
None on record
ALAN RAYMOND JONES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £122.13k £79.82k £82.58k £105.63k £101.02k
Total expenditure £119.26k £87.32k £100.48k £98.13k £94.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.95k £8.80k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hope Church UK
pre West Bromwich Assembly of God
Marsh Lane
Stone Cross
West Bromwich
B71 2DR
Phone:
01215882174