SUDANESE ENGINEERING SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SESUKI is active in promoting the professional and academic issues concerning the Sudanese engineeris and engineering students both in the UK and Sudan. It also tries to promote the engineering profession in th Sudan by linking the Sudanese engineering institutions with their British counterparts and facilitate the transfer of technology between the two countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sudan
Governance
- 12 February 1996: Standard registration
- SESUKI (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ADIL AHMED DAFA'ALLA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ABDURRAHMAN BABIKIR IZHAC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SAFWAN YOUSIF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMED ELFATIH ELNAIEM | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165 | £340 | £450 | £325 | £290 | |
|
Total expenditure | £149 | £324 | £435 | £310 | £275 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 June 2022 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH JANUARY 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF ENGINEERING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ADDITIONAL EQUIPMENT AND TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE TO EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN THE SUDAN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 THE CULVERT
BRADLEY STOKE
BRISTOL
BS32 8AB
- Phone:
- 01179362961
- Email:
- adil.dafaalla@airbus.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window