CALIFORNIA CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
California Christian Centre is a church with a strong emphasis on community involvement. Several initiatives are run weekly centring on the following objectives; Reliving the poor, needy, sick, disabled and elderly; Educating and training the surrounding community; Furtherance of the gospel of Jesus Christ and advancing the Kingdom of God; Building up the faith of Christian believers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 08 February 1996: Standard registration
- CALIFORNIA CHAPEL PENTECOSTAL CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Mark Cockling | Chair | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Joy Jewson | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Johnson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.35k | £58.14k | £37.90k | £35.07k | £17.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.34k | £39.24k | £46.62k | £33.09k | £8.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 6 MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED 23 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
178 STONEHOUSE LANE
BARTLEY GREEN
BIRMINGHAM
B32 3AH
- Phone:
- 01214277160
- Email:
- info@calcc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window