LOWER CAM UNDER FIVES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 08 February 1996: Standard registration
- 14 June 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LOWER CAM PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.20k | £23.28k | £19.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.22k | £24.72k | £19.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 31 May 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 31 May 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 14 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 14 March 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 23 February 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 23 February 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window