Accounts and annual returns GUILDFORD BREAST CANCER APPEAL

Charity number: 1052847
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 03 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 03 August 2009 276 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required