CROFTON INFANT SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1052854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Crofton Parents Staff Association (PSA) is an established group of parents and staff running an extremely active and varied programme of events throughout the school year. In its time the PSA has raised many thousands of pounds, which have been spent on improving equipment and resources to enhance our children's education and the facilities in school in general.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £77,821
Total expenditure: £74,698

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 February 1996: Standard registration
  • 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 23 May 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CROFTON INFANTS PSA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Qualters Trustee 19 January 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £59.83k £47.61k £59.57k £65.97k £77.82k
Total expenditure £42.67k £59.69k £70.00k £69.58k £74.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 15 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Crofton Infant School
Towncourt Lane
Petts Wood
Orpington
BR5 1EL
Phone:
01689826320