WATERSIDE GATEWAY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Club for adults from the age of 18 onwards with learning and/or physical difficulties in the Waterside Area. We meet monthly at various locations throughout the year and provide social, sport and learning forum for clients. We provide safe transport to and from events including various external outings that include visits to places of interest, walks, theatre and sporting venues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 12 February 1996: Standard registration
- THE WATERSIDE GATEWAY CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL WILLIAM COOPER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shani Elms | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Denise Vokes | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.49k | £1.46k | £3.96k | £7.80k | £8.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.20k | £1.57k | £7.45k | £8.92k | £6.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 February 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED 7 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY (ANY DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY OF THE MIND AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITION HOWSOEVER CAUSED AND WHETHER MILD, MODERATE OR SEVERE) IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS OR CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY; AND B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE TOTTON AND WATERSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BELVEDERE
CRACKNORE HARD LANE
MARCHWOOD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO40 4UT
- Phone:
- 02380866789
- Email:
- dvdelms@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
watersidegatewayclub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window