Porthcawl u3a

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Porthcawl U3A is a learning co-operative of older people. Its programme includes lectures, educational visits, cultural and social events and a wide range of study and interest groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Bridgend
- Neath Port Talbot
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 13 February 1996: Standard registration
- PORTHCAWL U3A (Working name)
- PORTHCAWL UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Roberts | Trustee | 09 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Davies | Trustee | 09 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Cowper | Trustee | 09 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Middleton | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Mason | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Keith Jones | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marcia Susan Humphries | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hopkins | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Rhys Fielding | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Richard Parry | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Corbett | Trustee | 20 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.32k | £23.30k | £7.65k | £24.17k | £26.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.84k | £9.28k | £11.60k | £28.56k | £27.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 November 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 November 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JUNE 1995 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 27 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
PORTHCAWL AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Ffynon Y Maen
Pyle
BRIDGEND
Mid Glamorgan
CF33 6JE
- Phone:
- 07773181467
- Email:
- sally2482atc@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window