CYLCH MEITHRIN FELINFACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NURSERY SCHOOL FOR CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 4, IN THE FELINFACH AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £44,849 from 3 government contract(s) and £5,134 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 13 February 1996: Standard registration
- CYLCH MEITHRIN YNYS-Y-PLANT (Working name)
- YSGOL FEITHRIN FELINFACH (Working name)
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mererid Jones | Chair | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Davina Aileen Juliana Evans | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eirian Mair Davies | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Delyth Mair Williams | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.68k | £37.72k | £43.49k | £68.14k | £61.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.36k | £41.92k | £40.29k | £36.83k | £41.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £21.70k | N/A | £36.00k | £30.07k | £44.85k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.17k | N/A | £17.05k | £5.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
26 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2022 | 263 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2022 | 263 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 March 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 July 2023 | 898 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DERBYNIWYD A CHADARNHAWYD Y CYFANSODDIAD AR 26AIN IONAWR 1996
Charitable objects
HYRWYDDO ADDYSG PLANT DAN OED YSGOL YN FELINFACH TRWY GYFRWNG YR IAITH GYMRAEG/ ENGLISH TRANSLATION - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE - SCHOOL CHILDREN IN FELINFACH THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE WELSH LANGUAGE.
Area of benefit
ARDAL FUDD FELINFACH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Y Caban Ysgol Felinfach
Felinfach
LAMPETER
Dyfed
SA48 8AE
- Phone:
- 07471685891
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window