Financial history THIRSK SCHOOL GOVERNORS FUND

Charity Number: 1052971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £158.63k £34.48k £61.61k £100.62k £74.74k
Total expenditure £141.31k £85.12k £57.72k £59.90k £123.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.00k