Trustees THIRSK SCHOOL GOVERNORS FUND
Charity Number: 1052971

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Horn | Chair | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Baxter | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Binks | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Burkinshaw | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steve Anderson | Trustee | 06 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Keane | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Irene Marwood | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Anne Silver | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
EMMA LAMBDEN | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Owain Pierce-Williams | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Guy Richard Baragwanath | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.