Bedfordshire Open Door

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a free counselling service for young people aged 13-25 years and cover Bedfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £54,904 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 21 February 1996: Standard registration
- 06 May 2025: Funds received from 1154339 BEDFORD COUNSELLING CENTRE
- BEDFORD OPEN DOOR (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Pearce | Chair | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vijay Sisodia | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mika Saha | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hilde Hendrickx | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Keiron Fletcher | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yannik MacKenzie | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anastassia Parsons | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEVE GARDNER | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Olatunji Atunrase | Trustee | 19 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.37k | £282.13k | £416.56k | £310.70k | £287.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £206.69k | £224.36k | £305.25k | £352.82k | £341.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £144.54k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.80k | £85.15k | N/A | £54.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH FEBRUARY 1996 as amended on 05 May 2021
Charitable objects
(1)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION; AND (11)TO RELIEVE MITIGATE AND PREVENT POVERTY SUFFERING HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
INITIALLY BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
120 TAVISTOCK STREET
BEDFORD
MK40 2SA
- Phone:
- 07922105200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window