ROTARY CLUB OF GOSFORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Payments to local and international charities and to Rotary Foundation charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 19 February 1996: Standard registration
- GOSFORTH ROTARY GOSFORTH ROTARY CLUB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ross Lambert MBE | Trustee | 07 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jean Banks | Trustee | 07 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.00k | £2.97k | £1.47k | £1.73k | £2.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.87k | £2.00k | £1.21k | £1.45k | £1.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 July 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
54, Clayworth Rd
Gosforth
Newcastle upon Tyne
Newcastle upon Tyne
Tyne & Wear
NE3 5AD
- Phone:
- 01912363681
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window