Accounts and annual returns BROUGHTON ASTLEY DRAMA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1053038
Charity reporting is overdue by 248 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 248 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 248 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 24 March 2022 205 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 08 October 2020 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required