BURWARTON AND CLEOBURY NORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1053039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Management of Village Hall facility for the use by inhabitants of the local and surrounding Parishes including use for meetings, lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £2,485
Total expenditure: £3,628

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 February 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CLEOBURY NORTH AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Pickup Chair 24 May 2017
CUMBRIAN RAILWAYS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Tracy Worthington Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
Deborah Jones Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
Jane Bufton Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
ROBERTA JARVIS Trustee 24 May 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.12k £11.80k £1.55k £2.30k £2.49k
Total expenditure £4.35k £2.93k £4.95k £5.02k £3.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.50k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 November 2023 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 March 2022 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 November 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHURCHYARD FARM
NEENTON
BRIDGNORTH
WV16 6RJ
Phone:
01746787093
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available