CHAPTER TWO

Charity Number: 1053047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Chapter Two promotes the Christian faith from a non-denominational standpoint. It publishes and distributes Christian literature in numerous languages and distributes Holy Bibles & Testaments in about 150 languages. Chapter Two has supplied HMP Chaplains for over five years with free non-English Bibles for prisoners in their care.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £296,895
Total expenditure: £331,415

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Gibraltar
  • India
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland
  • Spain

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 February 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIMON HAROLD ATTWOOD Chair 09 April 1996
UK FOUNDATION FOR CHRISTIAN SERVICE
Received: On time
Alastair Frank Warnes Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
Mark David Grasso Trustee 16 April 2009
THE GOSPEL HALL
Received: On time
HUGH ALAN CLARK Trustee 18 February 2005
THE GOSPEL HALL
Received: On time
MARYLON ELIZABETH CROSS Trustee 10 August 1977
CHRISTIAN OUTREACH TO THE HANDICAPPED
Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days
CMIAID
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £208.62k £243.82k £205.58k £326.70k £296.90k
Total expenditure £192.28k £208.58k £236.13k £342.89k £331.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 28 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 28 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 16 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 16 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 15 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 15 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 22 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 19 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Fountain House
3 Conduit Mews
Woolwich
London
SE18 7AP
Phone:
02083165389