THE NAPIER POWER HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educate about, promote and celebrate the engineering achievements of D.Napier & Son.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 February 1996: Standard registration
- NAPIER POWER HERITAGE TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE NICHOLAS BOOTHMAN | Chair | 12 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Elinor Catherine Boothman | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN NIGEL CHRISTOPHER PAINE | Trustee | 12 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
CLEN TOMLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Alastair Duncan Ure Reid | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN FRANCIS VESSEY C ENG MIED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/03/2020 | 19/03/2021 | 19/03/2022 | 19/03/2023 | 19/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.64k | £5.87k | £914 | £443 | £296 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.35k | £943 | £1.30k | £540 | £173 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 March 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JANUARY 1996 AS AMENDED 20 MAY 2010.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HERITAGE AND EDUCATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN THE HISTORY OF THE DEVELOPMENT OF ENGINES AND THE IMPORTANCE OF D. NAPIER AND SON'S CONTRIBUTION TO THAT HISTORY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Lodge
Bury Lane
Sutton
Ely
CB6 2BD
- Phone:
- 07966217826
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window