MWL NHS Charity

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide equipment, comfort items and therapeutic aids for patients. Provide education and training for both patients and staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Sefton
- St Helens
Governance
- 19 July 2005: Standard registration
- 17 October 2005: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
- THE ST HELENS AND KNOWSLEY HOSPITALS CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- WHISTON AND ST HELENS HOSPITALS CHARITY (Previous name)
- WHISTON AND ST HELENS HOSPITALS' CHARITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mersey and West Lancashire Teaching Hospitals NHS Trust | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £255.23k | £303.46k | £163.37k | £152.25k | £571.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £250.93k | £244.93k | £130.04k | £156.01k | £465.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £402.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £58.00k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £232.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £418.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £47.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £356.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £83.00k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.79m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £222.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 05/01/1996 AS AMENDED ON 22 JUN 2017 as amended on 01 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- CARDIAC REHABILITATION FUND
- ST HELENS AND KNOWSLEY COMMUNITY HEALTH GENERAL CHARITY
- ST HELENS AND KNOWSLEY COMMUNITY HEALTH TERMINAL ILLNESS FUND
- THE BURNS AND PLASTICS GENERAL FUND
- THE CANCER/LEUKAEMIA FUND
- THE CARDIORESPIRATORY RESEARCH AND GENERAL PURPOSE FUND
- THE CARE OF THE ELDERLY GENERAL FUND
- THE GENERAL MEDICINE GENERAL PURPOSE FUND
- THE GENERAL SURGERY FUND
- THE INTENSIVE CARE UNIT GENERAL FUND
- THE NEWTON HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- THE OBSTETRICS AND GYNAECOLOGY GENERAL FUND
- THE OPHTHALMOLOGY GENERAL FUND
- THE PSYCHIATRY GENERAL FUND
- THE RHEUMATOLOGY GENERAL PURPOSE FUND
- THE SPECIAL CARE BABY UNIT GENERAL FUND
- THE ST HELENS HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- THE WHISTON AND ST HELENS HOSPITALS CHILDREN'S FUND
- THE WHISTON HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- 19 July 2005 : Standard registration
- 17 October 2005 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whiston Hospital
Warrington Road
PRESCOT
L35 5DR
- Phone:
- 07776527287
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window