BLACK METHODIST MINISTRIES GROUP (LSW)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides training and advice to black people in the ministry within the Methodist Church. It also provides small grants towards educational resources
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 February 1996: Standard registration
- 09 September 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.13k | £8.34k | £3.07k | £8.56k | £2.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.26k | £7.83k | £4.25k | £7.26k | £4.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 08 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 27 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH SEPTEMBER 1995, AND AMENDED 30TH JANUARY 1996
Charitable objects
(A)TO ADVANCE THE METHODIST RELIGION BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT IN PARTICULAR GRANTS TO ETHNIC MINORITY MEMBERS OF THE METHODIST CHURCH TO ASSIST THEM IN OBTAINING PASTORAL OR THEOLOGICAL TRAINING OR SUCH OTHER SKILLS THAT WILL ENABLE THEM TO PLAY AN ACTIVE PART IN THE MINISTRY AND LEADERSHIP OF THE CHURCH. (B)TO PROMOTE GOOD RACE RELATIONS, ENDEAVOURING TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF RACE AND ENCOURAGING EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS. (C)PROMOTE ACTS OF WORSHIP WHERE EVERYONE WILL BE FREE TO WORSHIP IN A MANNER THAT AFFIRMS THEIR TRADITION, SPIRITUALITY AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window