MENTER IAITH RHONDDA CYNON TAF

Charity number: 1053135
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Ein nod yw i sicrhau bod y Gymraeg yn perthyn i bawb yn Rhondda Cynon Taf. Rydym yn hyrwyddo, cydlynu a chynnal gweithgareddau a gwasanaethau Cymraeg eu hiaith. Our aim is to ensure that the Welsh language belongs to all in Rhondda Cynon Taf. We promote, coordinate and deliver Welsh medium activities and services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021

Total income: £326,793
Total expenditure: £283,170

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Rhondda Cynon Taff

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 February 1996: Standard registration
  • 28 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MENTER IAITH (Working name)
  • MENTER IAITH-AR WAITH YN RHONDDA (Working name)
  • MENTER TAF-ELAI (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £314.75k £315.31k £349.85k £328.30k £326.79k
Total expenditure £315.01k £326.97k £376.75k £318.16k £283.17k
Income from government contracts £136.08k N/A £177.73k £28.57k N/A
Income from government grants £44.47k £170.67k £17.73k £107.77k £133.83k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On Time