HARROGATE CHRISTIAN SPIRITUAL HEALING CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of this church is to promote Spiritual Healing and the public observance and teaching of the religious philosophy of Spiritualism having regard for the Seven Principals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 23 February 1996: Standard registration
- HARROGATE SPIRITUAL HEALING CHURCH (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
June Schofield | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roy Schofield | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linda Abel | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Wake | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Thornes | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Johnstone | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor Best | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
susanna dockree | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
janet gledhill | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
martin birch | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.91k | £10.28k | £14.98k | £22.33k | £24.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.11k | £11.28k | £10.84k | £10.83k | £17.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 3 MAY 1977 AS VARIED BY A SCHEME DATED 5 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SPIRITUAL HEALING AND THE PUBLIC OBSERVANCE AND TEACHING OF THE RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPRITUALISM HAVING REGARD TO THE PRINCIPLES SET OUT IN PART 2 OF THE SAID SCHEDULE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spiritual Healing Church
14 Princes Square
HARROGATE
HG1 1LL
- Phone:
- 07526286021
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window