Governing document Currys Charitable Foundation
Charity Number: 1053215

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05/02/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/09/2015 as amended on 20 Aug 2018 as amended on 16 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SELECT AND IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.