ENHANCEABLE

Charity number: 1053246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of care, support, education and training services for people with cerebral palsy or another disability

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hounslow
  • Kingston Upon Thames
  • Merton
  • Richmond Upon Thames
  • Surrey
  • Sutton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 March 1996: Standard registration
  • 25 March 2019: Funds received from 252851 THE JAYBEE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen William Spencer Norton Chair 16 April 2020
NORTH SURREY GROUP SCOPE
Received: On time
VILLIERS PARK EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
DEAF UNITY
Received: On time
GOLDSMITHS STUDENTS' UNION
Received: 75 days late
SPEAKERS' CORNER TRUST
Received: On time
ENGLISH SPEAKING BOARD (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED
Received: On time
Alison Belinda Walters Trustee 03 September 2024
None on record
Graham Thomas Hutchings Trustee 30 January 2024
None on record
julian rice Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
angeline garvey Trustee 30 November 2020
None on record
Hannah Piper Trustee 23 February 2017
None on record
MARK MARTIN Trustee 24 August 2011
NORTH SURREY GROUP SCOPE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.87m £1.67m £2.12m £2.48m £2.70m
Total expenditure £1.94m £1.57m £2.05m £2.26m £2.57m
Income from government contracts £1.76m £1.40m £1.50m £1.55m £1.59m
Income from government grants N/A £144.74k £18.00k £5.11k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £10.55k £15.06k £2.98k £450 £1.34k
Income - Other trading activities £81.39k £34.38k £66.89k £64.92k £36.47k
Income - Charitable activities £1.76m £1.40m £1.99m £2.39m £2.59m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.78k £505 £32 £1.24k £8.68k
Income - Other £4.74k £219.72k £55.91k £22.51k £62.54k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.87m £1.51m £1.98m £2.19m £2.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £52.85k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £36.59k £0 £26.60k £31.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £64.54k £0 £67.08k £63.39k £35.68k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.04m £996.91k £1.00m £978.60k £1.89m
Long-term investments £148.62k £174.09k £190.51k £178.82k £193.62k
Other assets £944.53k £968.59k £944.54k £1.28m £901.14k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£31.70k -£26.75k -£6.60k -£4.21k -£1.96k
Total liabilities £878.46k £758.35k £671.77k £781.33k £1.19m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 March 2024 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ENHANCEABLE
13 GENEVA ROAD
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
KT1 2TW
Phone:
02085467350