BLACK HEALTH INITIATIVE (BHI)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BHI exists to primarily work with Dual heritage, African and African Caribbean Communities as well as other marginalised groups in addressing and challenging inequalities in health. Mission Statement: BHI aims to develop interventions that enable service users to make positive lifestyle choices in relation to their health and well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £92,222 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leeds City
Governance
- 27 February 1996: Standard registration
- BHI-BLACK HEALTH INITIATIVE (Working name)
- BCAT - THE BLACK HEALTH INITIATIVE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOFYANAH RAMZAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stuart Bailey | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|||||
NAZARENE ACTIVE | Trustee | 23 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
IRMA HEYLIGER OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.02k | £265.13k | £159.11k | £419.79k | £318.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £233.21k | £218.21k | £168.98k | £390.54k | £201.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £86.32k | £75.70k | £66.95k | £120.78k | £92.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/02/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/07/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/10/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/11/2008
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS BORN IN AFRICA, INDIA, PAKISTAN, BANGLADESH OR THE ISLANDS OF THE CARIBBEAN OR THE DESCENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS 2. TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE GOOD HEALTH OF SUCH PERSONS IN PARTICULAR WITH RELATION TO HIV/AIDS AND RELATED ISSUES AND ILLNESSES 3. TO SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE HIV AND ITS RELATED ILLNESSES, THEIR PARTNERS AND FAMILIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND OTHER SUPPORT SERVICES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ground Floor Suite 3
Call House Business Centre
Enfield Street
Leeds
LS7 1RF
- Phone:
- 01133070300
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window