Financial history GURDWARA SIRI GURU SINGH SABHA

Charity number: 1053275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £494.42k £213.49k £326.58k £436.94k £397.63k
Total expenditure £327.70k £246.87k £274.87k £380.43k £381.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A