GURDWARA SIRI GURU SINGH SABHA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objectives are to provide a cultural socio-religious base for Sikh community in Newcastle upon Tyne. The charity has continued in its objectives stated above by providing an open, easy and free means for the Sikh community in the area to engage in their religious and cultural heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 27 February 1996: Standard registration
- SIKH TEMPLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amarjit Singh Ladhar | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
GURSHARAN SARANG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SEWA GILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GURMAIL LALLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £494.42k | £213.49k | £326.58k | £436.94k | £397.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £327.70k | £246.87k | £274.87k | £380.43k | £381.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JANUARY 1978 AS AMENDED 26 NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SIKH FAITH, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
SIKH TEMPLE
COTTENHAM STREET
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 5QU
- Phone:
- 01912738011
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window