Accounts and annual returns TRING AND DISTRICT LOCAL HISTORY AND MUSEUM SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1053276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 February 2024 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required