Financial history TRING AND DISTRICT LOCAL HISTORY AND MUSEUM SOCIETY

Charity number: 1053276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.39k £21.22k £9.01k £15.87k £16.98k
Total expenditure £13.03k £14.69k £12.37k £16.89k £16.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £13.33k N/A £3.60k £2.00k