DICKENS SQUARE MASJID AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1053281
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education/Training Medical/Health/Sickness Relief of Poverty Overseas aid/Famine relief Religious activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 1996: Standard registration
  • 25 April 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BAITUL AZIZ MASJID AND ISLAMIC COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2009
Total gross income £1.94k £0
Total expenditure £449 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted