PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the association is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: Promoting and fostering good relations between parents, staff , and other members of the wider school community Engaging in fundraising activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 26 February 1996: Standard registration
- PAFS (Working name)
- ST JOHN THE BAPTIST PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Westron | Chair | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Golding | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Nash | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Blake | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.23k | £6.37k | £12.76k | £9.12k | £12.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.53k | £13.38k | £5.62k | £13.89k | £10.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 SEPTEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 3 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL AND DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CATCHMENT AREA OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St John the Baptist School
Waltham Chase
SO32 2LY
- Phone:
- 07941643785
- Email:
- pafswalthamchase@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window