THE COMBERTON VILLAGE HELP SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty,sickness and distress in the Village of Comberton and provide services for the charitable benefit of the Community. Organises Village Volunteer Car Scheme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 27 February 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA ANN MITTON | Chair | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Angela Donnelly | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|||||
LYNNE DAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN WELLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR JANET ALISON MCCABE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN REDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.46k | £785 | £1.31k | £3.01k | £1.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.44k | £792 | £1.26k | £2.97k | £1.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JANUARY 1996.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN THE VILLAGE OF COMBERTON, AND PROVIDE SERVICE FOR THE CHARITABLE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
COMBERTON VILLAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 WESTCROFT
COMBERTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 7EJ
- Phone:
- 07980940583
- Email:
- janetmccabe@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window