MANCHESTER OUTDOOR EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Membership subscriptions and donations amounted to ?317 this year. We gave a total of ? 960 in grants during the year to 2 schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £25,563 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Manchester City
Governance
- 26 February 1996: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF GHYLL HEAD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR JEFF SENEVIRATNE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Claire Redrobe | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gill Leng | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Sarah Clarke | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Vecchione | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Morrison | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROGER HENNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OWEN TYLER COOPER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £376 | £786 | £15.81k | £26.11k | £28.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £663 | £718 | £72 | £28.45k | £12.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 September 2023 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2022
(These accounts |
07 September 2023 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED 2 FEBRUARY 1996 AS AMENDED ON 18/09/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE BENEFIT FOR YOUNG PERSONS IN MANCHESTER WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE,SEX,POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER BELIEFS OR OPINIONS IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (1) TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR BY FURTHERING THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE GHYLL HEAD CENTRE (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING OUTDOOR PHYSICAL EDUCATION
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Horticultural and Learning Centre
Wythenshawe Park
Wythenshawe Road
MANCHESTER
M23 0AB
- Phone:
- 07985196313
- Email:
- members@moet.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window