SURREY HEATH BOROUGH COUNCIL MAYOR'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Surrey Heath Borough Council Mayor's Charity is constituted by deed of trust and is a registered charity no. 1053311. The object of the charity is such general charitable purposes for the benefit of the inhabitants of Surrey Heath and immediately surrounding areas as the trustees in their absolute discretion think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 February 1996: Standard registration
- 09 November 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 November 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarbie Kang | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Violet May Elizabeth Tedder | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.02k | £6.13k | £6.13k | £18.19k | £13.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.61k | £13.70k | £7.42k | £4.25k | £28.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13TH FEBRUARY 1996.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SURREY HEATH AND IMMEDIATELY SURROUNDING ARES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
SURREY HEATH BOROUGH COUNCIL AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Surrey Heath Borough Council
Surrey Heath House
Knoll Road
CAMBERLEY
GU15 3HD
- Phone:
- 01276707100
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window