MINSTEAD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of residential and day training work, social and domestic skills for young adults with learning disabilities. Provided through a range of activities from classroom studies, different levels of supervised accommodation in our own premises at local supported housing, work place skills through extensive horticultural and workplace facilities as well as work placements in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income:
£7,668,001
Donations and legacies | £734.75k | |
Charitable activities | £5.68m | |
Other trading activities | £1.22m | |
Investments | £32.05k | |
Other | £1.20k |
Total expenditure:
£7,626,826
Raising funds | £16.76k | |
Charitable activities | £7.57m | |
Other | £42.79k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £5,189,896 from 16 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £59.55k | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.57m | |
Retained for future use | £41.18k |
People

260 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
139 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 February 1996: Standard registration
- 01 August 2017: Funds received from 271485 THE FURZEY GARDENS CHARITABLE TRUST
- MINSTEAD TRAINING PROJECT LIMITED (Previous name)
- MINSTEAD TRAINING TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josephine Anne Grunwell | Chair | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr David William Naylor | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Louise Pestell | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elanor Clark | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Maximino Casanova | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gael Louise Sellwood | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Agnew | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Douglas Trumble | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Callaghan | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Morris Clark | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Olivia Mary McDonald | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Selby | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.26m | £4.59m | £5.36m | £6.49m | £7.67m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.76m | £3.68m | £5.27m | £6.71m | £7.63m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.19m | £728.80k | £3.84m | £4.44m | £5.19m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £192.65k | £100.66k | £15.46k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £826.23k | £1.25m | £808.94k | £670.75k | £734.75k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £7.48k | £1.25k | £514.14k | £50.91k | £1.22m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.40m | £3.32m | £4.03m | £5.76m | £5.68m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £590.77k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £19.61k | £5.94k | £586 | £10.90k | £32.05k | |
|
Income - Other | £394 | £9.51k | £2.89k | £0 | £1.20k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.72m | £3.64m | £5.24m | £6.66m | £7.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £40.23k | £29.95k | £30.51k | £29.18k | £16.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.90k | £0 | £0 | £28.09k | £9.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £6.62k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £5.69k | £0 | £18.79k | £42.79k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.93m | £4.98m | £5.40m | £5.40m | £5.43m | |
|
Long-term investments | £576.41k | £100 | £0 | £23.30k | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £924.05k | £2.44m | £2.39m | £2.20m | £2.20m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £873.69k | £896.06k | £1.20m | £1.26m | £1.22m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JAN 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 SEP 2017 as amended on 10 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
(1) TO SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY, OR OTHERWISE EXCLUDED BY THEIR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND MEMBERS OF THEIR FAMILY AND THEIR CARERS BY MEANS OF PROVIDING SERVICES, FACILITIES, CAMPAIGNING AND SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO LEAD MORE INDEPENDENT AND FULFILLING LIVES AND BECOME FULLY INTEGRATED IN SOCIETY. (2) TO PRESERVE, MAINTAIN AND DEVELOP THE HISTORIC GARDENS AND BUILDINGS PARTICULARLY AT FURZEY GARDENS, MINSTEAD FOR THE ENJOYMENT AND BENEFIT OF HORTICULTURAL GROUPS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE WHO ARE OTHERWISE EXCLUDED BY THEIR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (3) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE BETTER CARRYING OUT OF THE OBJECTS HEREIN REFERRED TO WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THIS OBJECT TO PROVIDE LIBRARY, WORKSHOP, RESEARCH, EMPLOYMENT, TRAINING, RECREATIONAL, SPIRITUAL AND OTHER RESIDENTIAL AND NON-RESIDENTIAL FACILITIES AS MAY BE NECESSARY TO PROMOTE SUCH OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Minstead Lodge
London Minstead
Minstead
LYNDHURST
SO43 7FT
- Phone:
- 02380812297
- Email:
- info@minsteadtrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window