THE DERBYSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The improvement in the quality of care of patients by the provision of equipment, services or facilities not normally provided by, or in addition to, the normal NHS service. The improvement of staff facilities, training and education not normally provided by, or in addition to, the normal NHS service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 27 February 1997: Standard registration
- C H C S CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- DERBYSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES NHS TRUST (Previous name)
- DERBYSHIRE COUNTY PCT CHARITIES (Previous name)
- DERBYSHIRE PRIMARY PCT CHARITIES (Previous name)
- NORTH DERBYSHIRE PRIMARY CARE TRUST CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derbyshire Community Health Charitable Trust | Trustee | 21 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.73k | £372.58k | £405.54k | £404.15k | £185.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.26k | £215.06k | £149.62k | £373.62k | £297.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7/2/1996
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ASH GREEN CHARITY
- BOLSOVER HOSPITAL CHARITY
- BUXTON COTTAGE HOSPITAL CHARITY
- CAVENDISH HOSPITAL CHARITY
- CAVENDISH HOSPITAL MEDICAL EQUIPMENT CHARITY
- CLAY CROSS HOSPITAL CHARITY
- DERBYSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL CHARITY
- NEWHOLME HOSPITAL CHARITY
- NORTH DERBYSHIRE COMMUNITY SERVICE CHARITY
- NORTH DERBYSHIRE COMMUNITY SERVICE NURSES CHARITY
- OCKBROOK AND BARROWASH RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
- THE DERBYSHIRE COUNTY PRIMARY CARE TRUST CHARITIES (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- THE SOUTHERN DERBYSHIRE HEALTH AUTHORITY (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- WALTON HOSPITAL CHARITY
- WALTON HOSPITAL PSYCHOGERIATRIC RESEARCH CHARITY
- WHITTINGTON HALL HOSPITAL CHARITY
- WHITTINGTON HALL HOSPITAL PATIENTS CHARITY
- WHITWORTH HOSPITAL CHARITY
- 27 February 1997 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
DCHS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
FINANCE DEPARTMENT
WALTON HOSPITAL
WHITECOTES LANE
CHESTERFIELD
S40 3HW
- Phone:
- 07717807540
- Email:
- cfenquiries@nhs.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window