HOUNSLOW AND SPELTHORNE NHS TRUST CHARITY
Charity number: 1053337
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 09/01/1996
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR THE SERVICES PROVIDED BY THE HOUNSLOW AND SPELTHORNE COMMUNITY AND MENTAL HEALTH NHS TRUST
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 29 AUGUST 1996 AS AFFECTED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT OF 1 APRIL 1999
Charitable objects
FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSE OF MEADOW HOUSE HOSPICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 09 December 1999 : Standard registration
- 26 April 2004 : Removed
- 26 April 2004 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.