HOME START DERBY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 28 February 1996: Standard registration
- 29 June 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 June 2005: Funds transferred to 1105676 FAMILY SUPPORT DERBYSHIRE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 04 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 01 September 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 1995 AS AMENDED 27 SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
1. TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS 2. TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN 3. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS 4. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window