RYEDALE YOUTH THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ryedale Youth Theatre produces an annual musical show at Easter. Around 70 children from the Ryedale area age 8 - 18 perform for 6 performances and have voluntary professional tuition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 28 February 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA WOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jessica Stannard | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Dale | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Louise Myers | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Gledhill | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Robinson | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
TERI ALDOUS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.23k | £1.93k | £31.77k | £25.19k | £30.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.62k | £617 | £25.12k | £29.10k | £33.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.63k | £625 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 FEBRUARY 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE ART OF DRAMA
Area of benefit
RYEDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 PIPPIN ROAD
MALTON
YO17 7YT
- Phone:
- 01653695652
- Email:
- babsmurray@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window