GILLING VILLAGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1053375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Gilling Village Charitable Trust was set up to give grants to organisations within the Gilling West Village to support projects & activities which benefit the village and its people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £483
Total expenditure: £1,604

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 February 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EILEEN MARGARET BAYLES Chair
None on record
Brenda Jean Gledhill Trustee 10 January 2023
None on record
ARTHUR RICHARD WATTS Trustee 27 January 2016
None on record
Richard Keith Bradley Trustee 19 January 2015
None on record
DAVID JOHN WOODS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £152 £21 £73 £247 £483
Total expenditure £166 £25 £148 £203 £1.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FAIRFIELD HOUSE
HARTFORTH LANE
GILLING WEST
RICHMOND
DL10 5JP
Phone:
01748 824692
Website:

No information available