Financial history KEATS HOUSE

Charity number: 1053381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £654.58k £384.79k £350.12k £493.01k £438.55k
Total expenditure £675.48k £377.66k £362.69k £478.62k £463.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £377.49k £13.71k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.06k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £99.65k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £32 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £552.84k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £658.80k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £16.68k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £9.80k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A