THE TAOIST TAI CHI SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education and training in Taoist religion, as taught by Mr Moy Lin Shin, in Great Britain and internationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 March 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Calvert | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth James MacLachlan | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Moira Pamela Jackson | Trustee | 10 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER JAMES JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILOMENA PRETSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS KATE MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.11m | £691.34k | £252.39k | £510.11k | £253.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.06m | £418.41k | £701.94k | £363.40k | £698.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £24.25k | £6.01k | N/A | £3.56k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £34.59k | £6.99k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.05m | £678.34k | N/A | £162.79k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £6 | £4 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £343.76k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £100 | £0 | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.05m | £413.67k | N/A | £362.77k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £10.35k | £4.74k | N/A | £635 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.07k | £9.00k | N/A | £12.60k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £456.42k | £62.89k | N/A | £133.66k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 FEBRUARY 1996, 22 JUNE 2002, 4 DECEMBER 2005 AND 16 FEBRUARY 2008. as amended on 28 May 2021 as amended on 05 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH WITHIN THE COMMUNITY THROUGHOUT GREAT BRITAIN AND INTERNATIONALLY THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND PRACTICE OF ALL LEVELS OF TAOIST TAI CHI ARTS. (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN TAOIST RELIGION, PHILOSOPHY, TRADITIONS AND ARTS AS PROMOTED BY THE SOCIETY'S FOUNDER MASTER MOY LIN SHIN
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND INTERNATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Taoist Tai Chi Society European Cen
Bounstead Road
Blackheath
COLCHESTER
CO2 0DE
- Phone:
- 01206576167
- Email:
- gb@taoist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window