Governing document THE TAOIST TAI CHI SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 FEBRUARY 1996, 22 JUNE 2002, 4 DECEMBER 2005 AND 16 FEBRUARY 2008. as amended on 28 May 2021 as amended on 05 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH WITHIN THE COMMUNITY THROUGHOUT GREAT BRITAIN AND INTERNATIONALLY THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND PRACTICE OF ALL LEVELS OF TAOIST TAI CHI ARTS. (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN TAOIST RELIGION, PHILOSOPHY, TRADITIONS AND ARTS AS PROMOTED BY THE SOCIETY'S FOUNDER MASTER MOY LIN SHIN
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND INTERNATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.